Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roland Aboujaoudé

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

Titular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia dei Maroniti


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
7 Sep 1930Born
25 Apr 195928.6Ordained PriestPriest
12 Jul 197544.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
12 Jul 197544.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia dei Maroniti
23 Aug 197544.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Arca in Phoenicia dei Maroniti
6 Jun 201180.7RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon
2 May 201988.6DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch} (Maronite), Lebanon

MicroData Summary
Roland Aboujaoudé
Bishop Roland Aboujaoudé
(born , died )
Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Antiochia {Antioch}

EventPlace
Birth PlaceJall-Eddib
Ordained BishopBeterke
Death PlaceNotre-Dame des Secours, Hospital, Byblos

  • a priest for 60.0 years
  • a bishop for 43.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

External Link(s):

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 13 Aug 2011
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 139
  • r: Annuario Pontificio, Year 2012, Page 837
  • d: CB, 2 May 2019
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 40, Number 2,520

============

Home | Countries | Religious Men Women | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2025
Code: web_b, v3.4.1, 22 Mar 2025; Data: 28 Apr 2025